MD SB993 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include Delmarva Community Services, Inc. and the Maryland Association of Counties Pooled OPEB Trust Fund.
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1474 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |