ME LD1104 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt School Resource Officers from Department of Education Background Check and Fingerprinting Requirements
Title
An Act To Exempt School Resource Officers from Department of Education Background Check and Fingerprinting Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. David Haggan [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Kevin Battle [R] | Rep. Paul Chace [R] |
Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Abden Simmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-283), in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-283) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-283). |
2017-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |