ME LD1173 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Law Allowing Concealed Weapons in State Parks with Certain Exceptions
Title
An Act To Repeal the Law Allowing Concealed Weapons in State Parks with Certain Exceptions
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Charles Priest [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] |
Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] | Rep. Joshua Plante [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-07 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-05 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-05 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-05 | House | Representative DION of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-06-03 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1173&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0410&item=1&snum=126 |