ME LD1248 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure the Quality of Bottled Water
Title
An Act to Ensure the Quality of Bottled Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-06-16 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-483) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) READ |
2023-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto. |
2023-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, House Amendment "A" (H-483) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) was READ. |
2023-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-15 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |