ME LD1330 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Ensure Compliance by the State with an Agreement Regarding the Operation of the Landfill in Old Town
Title
Resolve, to Ensure Compliance by the State with an Agreement Regarding the Operation of the Landfill in Old Town
Sponsors
Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Scott Landry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |