ME LD1467 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Regarding the State's Cellular Telephone Recycling Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Regarding the State's Cellular Telephone Recycling Law

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2019-05-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-07SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-05-02HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-02HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-04-02SenateBill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2019-04-02SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
2019-04-02HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-04-02HouseRepresentative TUCKER for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to Joint Order 2019, H.P. 883 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback