ME LD1552 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Reentry Services to Persons Reentering the Community after Incarceration
Title
An Act To Provide Reentry Services to Persons Reentering the Community after Incarceration
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Richard Evans [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-04 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1552&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1157&item=1&snum=130 |