ME LD1558 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prohibit the Sale of Tobacco Products in Pharmacies and Retail Establishments Containing Pharmacies
Title
An Act to Prohibit the Sale of Tobacco Products in Pharmacies and Retail Establishments Containing Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #304 (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #180 (Y: 73 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #180 (Y: 73 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-425) in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-425) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 304 Yeas 22 - Nays 10 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-425). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-425) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 180 (Yeas 73 - Nays 69 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |