ME LD1602 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Stakeholder Group Convened by the Emergency Medical Services' Board on Financial Health of Ambulance Services
Title
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Stakeholder Group Convened by the Emergency Medical Services' Board on Financial Health of Ambulance Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-07-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-07-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) thereto. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) was ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-338). |
2023-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-338). |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-338) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2023-04-12 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported by Senator BAILEY of York for the Joint Standing Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Order 2023, S.P. 594 |