ME LD162 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Title
An Act To Repeal the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Larry Dunphy [R] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] |
Rep. Aaron Libby [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #257 (Y: 86 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 257 (Yeas 86 - Nays 54 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-07 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |