ME LD1637 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Medicaid Payment from a Savings Account Established under the Federal ABLE Act of 2014
Title
An Act To Prevent Medicaid Payment from a Savings Account Established under the Federal ABLE Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] |
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] | Rep. Christina Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-179). |
2019-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-179). |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-179) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |