ME LD1653 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 124: Emergency Medical Services Personnel Reporting Rule, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services, Maine Center for Disease Control and Prevention
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 124: Emergency Medical Services Personnel Reporting Rule, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services, Maine Center for Disease Control and Prevention
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported by Representative MEYER for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072 and approved for introduction by a majority of the Legislative Council. |