ME LD1670 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to Rating on the Basis of Group Size in the Small Group Health Insurance Market
Title
An Act Relating to Rating on the Basis of Group Size in the Small Group Health Insurance Market
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Jonathan Mckane [R] | Rep. Susan Morissette [R] |
Sen. Debra Plowman [R] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] | Sen. Lois Snowe-mello [R] | Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-522) | |
2012-04-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-04-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-522). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-522) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |