ME LD1673 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Sexual Solicitation of a Child by any Means
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Sexual Solicitation of a Child by any Means
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-504) | |
2012-03-30 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-30 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-504). | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-504) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |