ME LD1711 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Adopt the Use of Standardized Risk Assessment in the Management of Domestic Violence Crimes
Title
An Act To Adopt the Use of Standardized Risk Assessment in the Management of Domestic Violence Crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] |
Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Rep. Charles Priest [D] | Sen. Richard Woodbury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-600). | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-600) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-600) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) , in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-890), in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) | |
2012-04-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-04-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2011. |