ME LD1727 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Protect Northern Maine Standard-offer Ratepayers
Title
An Act to Protect Northern Maine Standard-offer Ratepayers
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Donald Ardell [R] | Rep. Steven Foster [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] |
Rep. Austin Theriault [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |