ME LD1747 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Municipalities from Imposing Fees on Ice Fishing Shacks
Title
An Act To Prohibit Municipalities from Imposing Fees on Ice Fishing Shacks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-734), in concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-734) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-734) | |
2012-03-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-01-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-01-17 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-11 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-11 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE . | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |