ME LD1794 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Establish the Commission on Predictability of Mandated Overtime for Pulp or Paper Manufacturing Facility Employees
Title
Resolve, to Establish the Commission on Predictability of Mandated Overtime for Pulp or Paper Manufacturing Facility Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Roger Albert [R] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Amy Roeder [D] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Sen. Michael Tipping [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - Report 'a' Otp-am By Ca 'a' RC #488 (Y: 82 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #666 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #666 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-04-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-670). |
2024-04-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-670) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 488 (Yeas 82 - Nays 66 - Absent 2 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-670) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-670) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 666 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-670) ACCEPTED |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |