ME LD1848 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Notification Requirements of the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Title
An Act To Expand the Notification Requirements of the Maine Certificate of Need Act of 2002
Sponsors
Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
Sen. Earle Mccormick [R] | Rep. Howard Mcfadden [R] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-493) | |
2012-03-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-493). | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-493) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |