ME LD1850 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Assist Maine's Current and Former Members of the United States Armed Forces
Title
An Act To Assist Maine's Current and Former Members of the United States Armed Forces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) | |
2012-03-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-492). | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Report READ and REJECTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |