ME LD187 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Eliminate the Energy Efficiency and Renewable Resource Fund and to Provide Needs-based Low-income Assistance
Title
An Act to Eliminate the Energy Efficiency and Renewable Resource Fund and to Provide Needs-based Low-income Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133). |
2023-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) Report, |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S--133) Report. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-02-16 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |