ME LD1888 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the State's Ability To Investigate and Prosecute Misuse of Public Benefits
Title
An Act To Strengthen the State's Ability To Investigate and Prosecute Misuse of Public Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-608) thereto | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-608) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-608) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-608) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, under further suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-542), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-542), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules on motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 321 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-542). | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) was ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 316 (Yeas 73 - Nays 70 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-11 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, House Amendment "A" (H-936) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) On motion of Representative STUCKEY of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-936) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) was READ. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) was READ. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) On motion of Representative STRANG BURGESS of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-542).. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) READ and ADOPTED . | |
2012-04-10 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-542) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2012-03-19 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |