ME LD1892 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Joint Standing Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry under the State Government Evaluation Act
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Joint Standing Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry under the State Government Evaluation Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ TWICE and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Reported by Representative EDGECOMB for the Joint Standing Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 955, subsection 4. |