ME LD201 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) The Senate ADHERED Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) The Senate ADHERED Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modernize and Reduce the Cost of Driver Education
Title
An Act To Modernize and Reduce the Cost of Driver Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (S) The Senate ADHERED Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-03-31 | (S) 7 Yeas - 27 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent motion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland To RECEDE and CONCUR Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 24 | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Subsquently Taken from the table by the President Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland To ADHERE | |
2011-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION | |
2011-03-30 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-12). | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-12) | |
2011-03-24 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-12) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 11 (Yeas 23 - Nays 119 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Representative CEBRA of Naples moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=201&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0178&item=1&snum=125 |