ME LD2116 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require Flame-retardant Seats on New School Buses
Title
An Act to Require Flame-retardant Seats on New School Buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2116&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0909&item=1&snum=131 |