ME LD2123 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Licensure of Emergency Medical Services Persons
Title
An Act Regarding Licensure of Emergency Medical Services Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |