ME LD2200 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Attract and Retain Behavioral Health Clinicians
Title
Resolve, to Attract and Retain Behavioral Health Clinicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-02-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-01 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2200&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0936&item=1&snum=131 |