ME LD28 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Marine Resources To Evaluate the Limited-entry Lobster and Crab Fishing Licensing System
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Marine Resources To Evaluate the Limited-entry Lobster and Crab Fishing Licensing System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #348 (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-686), in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-686) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator MIRAMANT of Knox the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reports Read |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-686). |
2020-02-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-686) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-02-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-02-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 348 (Yeas 95 - Nays 44 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) - Vacant 2 |
2020-02-25 | House | On motion of Representative McCREIGHT of Harpswell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |