ME LD582 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - HELD BY GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - HELD BY GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Enhance Certain Penalties for Possession of Firearms by Prohibited Persons
Title
An Act to Enhance Certain Penalties for Possession of Firearms by Prohibited Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #490 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | HELD BY GOVERNOR |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 490 Yeas 21 - Nays 5 - Excused 9 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-318). |
2023-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-20 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |