ME LD587 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Increase Residential Care and Nursing Facility Residents' Personal Needs Allowances Under the MaineCare Program
Title
Resolve, to Increase Residential Care and Nursing Facility Residents' Personal Needs Allowances Under the MaineCare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-131). |
2023-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-131) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-131) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |