ME LD653 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Establish the Maine Commission on Public Defense Services and Establish Public Defender Offices for Aroostook, Penobscot and Piscataquis Counties
Title
An Act to Establish the Maine Commission on Public Defense Services and Establish Public Defender Offices for Aroostook, Penobscot and Piscataquis Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-21 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-579). |
2024-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-579). |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-579) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |