ME LD761 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing the Crime of Endangering the Welfare of a Child and to Create the Crime of Aggravated Endangering the Welfare of a Child
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing the Crime of Endangering the Welfare of a Child and to Create the Crime of Aggravated Endangering the Welfare of a Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #261 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-07-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-222) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-222) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 261 Yeas 11 - Nays 21 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox moved to The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered: TABLED |
2023-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |