ME LD798 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Improve the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Enactment RC #481 (Y: 126 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 481 (Yeas 126 - Nays 2 - Absent 20 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-449). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-449). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-449) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |