ME LD856 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Balance Renewable Energy Development with Natural and Working Lands Conservation
Title
An Act To Balance Renewable Energy Development with Natural and Working Lands Conservation
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-826) in concurrence |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-826) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-826). |
2022-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-826) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Bill was REFERRED to the Committees on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed. |