ME LD994 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Include Possession of Compounds, Mixtures or Substances Containing a Detectable Amount of Certain Scheduled Drugs to Prove the Offense of Unlawful Trafficking of Scheduled Drugs
Title
An Act to Include Possession of Compounds, Mixtures or Substances Containing a Detectable Amount of Certain Scheduled Drugs to Prove the Offense of Unlawful Trafficking of Scheduled Drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Rep B Ontp RC #230 (Y: 83 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Report A Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 230 (Yeas 83 - Nays 63 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, REPORT B Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-04-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |