MI HB4077 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology
Pending: Senate Energy And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology
Pending: Senate Energy And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Energy: gas and oil; requirement for security measures preventing public access to unattended self-service fueling stations; prohibit LARA from imposing. Amends sec. 21106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21106).
Title
Energy: gas and oil; requirement for security measures preventing public access to unattended self-service fueling stations; prohibit LARA from imposing. Amends sec. 21106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21106).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2022-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2022-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 Yeas 60 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2021 |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2021-02-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |
Subjects
Energy: gas and oil
Fire: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Transportation: other
Fire: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Transportation: other