MI HB4159 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 259'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 259'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; brownfield redevelopment authorities; provide oversight. Amends secs. 2, 8, 13, 13b, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.).
Title
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; brownfield redevelopment authorities; provide oversight. Amends secs. 2, 8, 13, 13b, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 524 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 532 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 532 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 259'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 12:50 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:00 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:33 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 524 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 532 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Amended |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
Subjects
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund
Economic development: tax increment financing
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund
Economic development: tax increment financing
State agencies (existing): environmental quality