MI HB4262 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Labor; youth employment; parent or legal guardian of a minor being educated at the minor's home; allow to issue a work permit for the minor. Amends sec. 2 of 1978 PA 90 (MCL 409.102).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor; youth employment; parent or legal guardian of a minor being educated at the minor's home; allow to issue a work permit for the minor. Amends sec. 2 of 1978 PA 90 (MCL 409.102).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative John Reilly

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback