MI HB4325 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Assigned Pa 96'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Assigned Pa 96'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: counselors; scope of practice for counselors; modify, and revise licensing requirements. Amends secs. 16201, 18101, 18107, 18111 & 18115 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16201 et seq.) & adds secs. 18106, 18112, 18114 & 18116.
Title
Health occupations: counselors; scope of practice for counselors; modify, and revise licensing requirements. Amends secs. 16201, 18101, 18107, 18111 & 18115 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16201 et seq.) & adds secs. 18106, 18112, 18114 & 18116.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Assigned Pa 96'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/29/2019 02:35 Pm |
2019-10-29 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/29/2019 11:35 Am |
2019-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/21/2019 02:17 Pm |
2019-10-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-10-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-10-08 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-08 | House | Title Amended |
2019-10-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-08 | House | Substitute (h-7) Adopted |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-7) |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |