MI HB4331 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: property and casualty; insurance withholding amount for fire-damaged homes; increase, and allow for abandoned funds to be used for repairs. Amends sec. 2227 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2227).
Title
Insurance: property and casualty; insurance withholding amount for fire-damaged homes; increase, and allow for abandoned funds to be used for repairs. Amends sec. 2227 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2227).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-09-26 | House | Transmitted |
2023-09-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 Yeas 100 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-09-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2023 |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2023-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Karen Whitsett |