MI HB4695 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; seasonal weight restrictions; exempt trucks transporting potable water. Amends sec. 722 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.722).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; seasonal weight restrictions; exempt trucks transporting potable water. Amends sec. 722 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.722).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-04-14 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 57 Nays 51 |
2016-04-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-06-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/10/2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |