MI HB4726 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Reconsider Vote Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Reconsider Vote Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; minimum number of unpaid parking tickets a person may have before the secretary of state will not issue or renew the person's driver license; revise. Amends sec. 321a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.321a).
Title
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; minimum number of unpaid parking tickets a person may have before the secretary of state will not issue or renew the person's driver license; revise. Amends sec. 321a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.321a).
Sponsors
Rep. George Cushingberry [D] | Rep. Robert Dean [D] | Rep. Kevin Green [R] | Sen. Vincent Gregory [D] |
Rep. Robert Jones [D] | Rep. Andrew Kandrevas [D] | Rep. Roy Schmidt [D] | Rep. James Slezak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Reconsider Vote Postponed | |
2010-06-30 | Defeated Roll Call # 338 Yeas 14 Nays 23 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2010-06-24 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2010-06-24 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2010-06-08 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-06-08 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-08 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-12-03 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2009-12-03 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2009-12-03 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-10-20 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-10-15 | Transmitted | |
2009-10-15 | Passed Roll Call # 501 Yeas 68 Nays 37 | |
2009-10-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-10-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-10-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-08 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-08 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-04-01 | Printed Bill Filed 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-03-31 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced By Representative Roy Schmidt |
Subjects
Courts, district court
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, driver license
Traffic control, parking
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, driver license
Traffic control, parking