MI HB4779 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:04 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:04 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; other; uniform electronic legal material; provide for. Amends title of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) & adds ch. 1A.
Title
Legislature; other; uniform electronic legal material; provide for. Amends title of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) & adds ch. 1A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 884 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 792 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 792 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:04 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 488'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:46 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:07 Am |
2018-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 884 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 792 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-01-25 | House | Transmitted |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/20/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Kosowski |