MI HB5103 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Bill Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Bill Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; certain requirements for obtaining a driver license; remove. Amends secs. 303 & 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.303 & 257.304).
Title
Traffic control: driver license; certain requirements for obtaining a driver license; remove. Amends secs. 303 & 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.303 & 257.304).
Sponsors
Rep. Donavan McKinney [D] | Rep. Nate Shannon [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Betsy Coffia [D] |
Rep. Rachel Hood [D] | Rep. Jason Morgan [D] | Rep. Joey Andrews [D] | Rep. Mike McFall [D] |
Rep. Abraham Aiyash [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 94 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-04-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 94 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2023-11-08 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 Yeas 60 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023 |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-10-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Donavan Mckinney |