MI HB5131 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 226'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 226'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; candidates; reference to elected office of county auditor in the election law; remove. Amends sec. 697 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.697). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5052'17, HB 5072'17, HB 5084'17, HB 5114'17
Title
Elections; candidates; reference to elected office of county auditor in the election law; remove. Amends sec. 697 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.697). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5052'17, HB 5072'17, HB 5084'17, HB 5114'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 226'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 2:02 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:40 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/19/2018 @ 2:36 Pm |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-02-14 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-10-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2017 |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Kosowski |