MI HB5167 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 471'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 471'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; contracts entered into by state transportation departments and local road agencies; change bidding requirements and allow state transportation department to borrow money from local road agencies. Amends secs. 11 & 11c of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661 & 247.661c).
Title
Transportation; funds; contracts entered into by state transportation departments and local road agencies; change bidding requirements and allow state transportation department to borrow money from local road agencies. Amends secs. 11 & 11c of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661 & 247.661c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 916 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 778 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 210 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 778 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 210 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 471'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:38 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:34 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 11:48 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 916 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-19 | House | Retransmitted |
2014-12-19 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 778 Yeas 107 Nays 3 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In As Substituted H-3 |
2014-12-19 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-06-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reconsider Vote Withdrawn |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reconsider Vote Postponed |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 210 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-12-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/05/2013 |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Wayne Schmidt |