MI HB5232 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: public school academies; certain authorizer and educational management organization information on school signage, advertising, and promotional materials; require. Amends sec. 553 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.553).
Title
Education: public school academies; certain authorizer and educational management organization information on school signage, advertising, and promotional materials; require. Amends sec. 553 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.553).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-10-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/25/2023 |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-10-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie A. Young |