MI HB5384 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Housing: landlord and tenants; definition of residential premises; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1978 PA 454 (MCL 554.632).
Title
Housing: landlord and tenants; definition of residential premises; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1978 PA 454 (MCL 554.632).
Sponsors
Rep. John Roth [R] | Rep. Kelly Breen [D] | Rep. Denise Mentzer [D] | Rep. Kara Hope [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-12-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 |
2023-11-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-11-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-14 | House | Introduced By Representative John R. Roth |