MI HB5404 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 525'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 525'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land use; land division; landlocked cemeteries; explicitly prohibit in land division and platting processes. Amends secs. 109 & 182 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109 & 560.182).
Title
Land use; land division; landlocked cemeteries; explicitly prohibit in land division and platting processes. Amends secs. 109 & 182 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109 & 560.182).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 960 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 525'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 5:02 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:26 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:28 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 960 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2012-05-22 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-02-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/16/2012 |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs |
2012-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Dale Zorn |