MI HB5418 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 508'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 508'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; employment preference; voluntary veterans' preference; allow for private businesses. Creates new act.
Title
Labor; employment preference; voluntary veterans' preference; allow for private businesses. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 913 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 634 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 634 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 508'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 11:53 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:06 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/2/2015 @ 12:00 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 913 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2014-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-04 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 634 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-03-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/21/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced By Representative David Knezek |
Subjects
Labor, employment preference
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans, employment
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans, employment